California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2410 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/23/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2410CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 160 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 23, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 23, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 2, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 8, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 20 to the Elections Code, relating to elective office. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2410, Fuentes. Elective office: felony conviction. Existing law prescribes various eligibility and procedural requirements for a person to become a candidate for elective office. This bill would prohibit the consideration of a person as a candidate for, and would provide that the person is not eligible to be elected to, any state or local elective office if the person has been convicted of a felony involving accepting or giving, or offering to give, any bribe, the embezzlement of public money, extortion or theft of public money, perjury, or conspiracy to commit any of those crimes. The bill would provide that "conviction of a felony" includes a conviction of a felony in this state and a conviction under the laws of any other state, the United States, or any foreign government or country of a crime that, if committed in this state, would be a felony, and for which the person has not received a pardon from the Governor of this state, the governor or other officer authorized to grant pardons in another state, the President of the United States, or the officer of the foreign government or country authorized to grant pardons in that foreign jurisdiction. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 20 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 20. (a) A person shall not be considered a candidate for, and is not eligible to be elected to, any state or local elective office if the person has been convicted of a felony involving accepting or giving, or offering to give, any bribe, the embezzlement of public money, extortion or theft of public money, perjury, or conspiracy to commit any of those crimes. (b) For purposes of this section, "conviction of a felony" includes a conviction of a felony in this state and a conviction under the laws of any other state, the United States, or any foreign government or country of a crime that, if committed in this state, would be a felony, and for which the person has not received a pardon from the Governor of this state, the governor or other officer authorized to grant pardons in another state, the President of the United States, or the officer of the foreign government or country authorized to grant pardons in that foreign jurisdiction.