|
08/08/2012
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 (c).
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kehoe.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 1469.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|