LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB246
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB246
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB246
Compare Versions
AB246 Amended June 26, 2012
AB246 Amended May 8, 2012
AB246 Amended February 13, 2012
AB246 Amended March 29, 2011
AB246 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB246 Amended June 26, 2012
AB246 Amended May 8, 2012
AB246 Amended February 13, 2012
AB246 Amended March 29, 2011
AB246 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare