|
09/20/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6321.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4704.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5135.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|