California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2478 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012