|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|