LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB249
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB249
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB249
Compare Versions
AB249 Amended January 4, 2012
AB249 Amended August 22, 2011
AB249 Amended April 4, 2011
AB249 Amended March 15, 2011
AB249 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB249 Amended January 4, 2012
AB249 Amended August 22, 2011
AB249 Amended April 4, 2011
AB249 Amended March 15, 2011
AB249 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare