|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2894.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2205.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1715.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|