California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB25 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/04/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 25CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 456 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 4, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 4, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 6, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 30, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 6, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hayashi (Coauthors: Assembly Members Buchanan, Conway, Fong, Hill, Huffman, Ma, Nestande, John A. Prez, and Smyth) (Coauthors: Senators Alquist, Padilla, Steinberg, and Strickland) DECEMBER 6, 2010 An act to add Section 49475 to the Education Code, relating to athletics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 25, Hayashi. School districts: athletics: concussions and head injuries. Existing law authorizes school districts to provide specified medical services in connection with athletic events that are under the jurisdiction of, or sponsored or controlled by, school districts. These services include medical or hospital insurance for pupils injured while participating in athletic activities and ambulance service for pupils, instructors, spectators, and other individuals in attendance at athletic activities. This bill would require a school district that elects to offer athletic programs to immediately remove from a school-sponsored athletic activity for the remainder of the day an athlete who is suspected of sustaining a concussion or head injury during that activity. The bill would prohibit the return of the athlete to that activity until he or she is evaluated by, and receives written clearance from, a licensed health care provider, as specified. The bill would require, on a yearly basis, a concussion and head injury information sheet to be signed and returned by the athlete and the athlete's parent or guardian before the athlete's initiating practice or competition. These provisions would not apply to an athlete engaged in an athletic activity during the regular schoolday or as part of a physical education course, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 49475 is added to the Education Code, to read: 49475. (a) If a school district elects to offer an athletic program, the school district shall comply with both of the following: (1) An athlete who is suspected of sustaining a concussion or head injury in an athletic activity shall be immediately removed from the activity for the remainder of the day, and shall not be permitted to return to the activity until he or she is evaluated by a licensed health care provider, trained in the management of concussions, acting within the scope of his or her practice. The athlete shall not be permitted to return to the activity until he or she receives written clearance to return to the activity from that licensed health care provider. (2) On a yearly basis, a concussion and head injury information sheet shall be signed and returned by the athlete and the athlete's parent or guardian before the athlete's initiating practice or competition. (b) This section does not apply to an athlete engaging in an athletic activity during the regular schoolday or as part of a physical education course required pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 51220.