|
08/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 177, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5758.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4286.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4887.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|