California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 8, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2012

Amended

Bill June 28, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012