|
09/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6247.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4635.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4819.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|