California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2527 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 15, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012