|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 2). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5096.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|