California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012