|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 431, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6323.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4692.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5198.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|