California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 16, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012