05/14/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
04/26/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/23/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/05/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |