California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill April 25, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 7, 2012