|
09/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 6376.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4765.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 5181.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|