California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012