|
08/30/2012
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5029.)
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4895.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Page 4875.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6206.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|