California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2564 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 13, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012
Bill April 25, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012