|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 592, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6751.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5030.). Amended pursuant to Joint Rule 23.5. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5031.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 5071.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|