LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2609
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2609
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2609
Compare Versions
AB2609 Chaptered September 26, 2012
AB2609 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2609 Amended August 30, 2012
AB2609 Amended August 16, 2012
AB2609 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2609 Amended April 11, 2012
AB2609 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2609 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2609 Chaptered September 26, 2012
AB2609 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2609 Amended August 30, 2012
AB2609 Amended August 16, 2012
AB2609 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2609 Amended April 11, 2012
AB2609 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2609 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare