|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6759.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5047.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Simitian.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4830.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|