California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2669 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill June 21, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012