|
09/28/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6518.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4873.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4672.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|