LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2672
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2672
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2672
Compare Versions
AB2672 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2672 Amended August 22, 2012
AB2672 Amended April 26, 2012
AB2672 Amended April 10, 2012
AB2672 Introduced March 5, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2672 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2672 Amended August 22, 2012
AB2672 Amended April 26, 2012
AB2672 Amended April 10, 2012
AB2672 Introduced March 5, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare