|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 842, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6567.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4889.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4788.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 4712.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|