LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2674
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2674
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2674
Compare Versions
AB2674 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB2674 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2674 Amended August 23, 2012
AB2674 Amended August 20, 2012
AB2674 Amended July 3, 2012
AB2674 Amended April 9, 2012
AB2674 Amended March 27, 2012
AB2674 Introduced March 5, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2674 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB2674 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB2674 Amended August 23, 2012
AB2674 Amended August 20, 2012
AB2674 Amended July 3, 2012
AB2674 Amended April 9, 2012
AB2674 Amended March 27, 2012
AB2674 Introduced March 5, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare