09/17/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/17/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
09/11/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |||
08/28/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/27/2012 | Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/14/2012 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |||
08/13/2012 | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/09/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4444.). | |||
07/06/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
07/05/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4782.) | |||
05/09/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). | |||
03/13/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 12. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read first time. To print. |