BILL NUMBER: AB 2685CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 348 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 17, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 17, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 9, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Judiciary (Feuer (Chair), Atkins, Dickinson, Huber, Monning, and Wieckowski) MARCH 12, 2012 An act to amend Sections 6140 and 6141 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2685, Committee on Judiciary. Attorneys: annual membership fees. Existing law, the State Bar Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of attorneys by the State Bar of California, a public corporation. The State Bar is governed by a board of trustees. Existing law, until January 1, 2013, requires the board to charge an annual membership fee for active members of up to $315 for 2012 minus a specified $10 rebate. Existing law also requires the board to charge an annual membership fee for inactive members of up to $75 minus a specified $10 rebate. This bill would, until January 1, 2014, require the board to charge that annual membership fee for active members, and would delete the provisions providing for a rebate for both active and inactive members. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6140 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 6140. (a) The board shall fix the annual membership fee for active members for 2013 at a sum not exceeding three hundred fifteen dollars ($315). (b) The annual membership fee for active members is payable on or before the first day of February of each year. If the board finds it appropriate and feasible, it may provide by rule for payment of fees on an installment basis with interest, by credit card, or other means, and may charge members choosing any alternative method of payment an additional fee to defray costs incurred by that election. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2014, and, as of that date, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2014, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 6141 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 6141. (a) Until December 31, 2006, the board shall fix the annual membership fee for inactive members at a sum not exceeding sixty-five dollars ($65). On January 1, 2007, and thereafter, the board shall fix the annual membership fee for inactive members at a sum not exceeding seventy-five dollars ($75). The annual membership fee for inactive members is payable on or before the first day of February of each year. (b) An inactive member shall not be required to pay the annual membership fee for inactive members for any calendar year following the calendar year in which the member attains the age of 70 years.