|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 759, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6519.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4860.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4830.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|