California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012