|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 770, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6749.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5033.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4887.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|