California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012