|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3127.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2388.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1456.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1335.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|