California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB270 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/02/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 270CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 393 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 2, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 2, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 12, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Perea (Coauthor: Assembly Member Hill) FEBRUARY 7, 2011 An act to amend Section 19522 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to satellite wagering. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 270, Perea. Satellite wagering. Existing law requires that every person who participates in, or has anything to do with, the racing of horses and every employee of a parimutuel department be licensed by the California Horse Racing Board. Existing law requires the board to set forth requirements for the position of satellite facility supervisor for all satellite wagering facilities operated by the state or on public land. The supervisor is required to monitor the performance of licensees at the facilities. This bill would create an exception from that provision by authorizing a fair satellite facility generating less than $10,000,000 annually in total handle to elect not to be subject to the requirements related to a satellite facility supervisor if the board of directors of the fair satellite facility, after a public hearing, deems those requirements to be not economically feasible, under specified conditions. Those conditions would include a requirement that the fair board notify the California Horse Racing Board in writing of its intention to take that action 30 days prior to the public hearing, and that notice of the fair board's action be provided to the California Horse Racing Board within 10 days of approval by the fair board. The bill would require the fair satellite facility to continue to abide by all laws and regulations pertaining to the operation of a satellite facility, including the responsibilities of the position of satellite facility supervisor. The bill would also require that notice of the fair board's action include the name and contact information of the individual or individuals assuming the responsibilities of the satellite facility supervisor position. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 19522 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 19522. (a) The board shall also set forth requirements for the position of satellite facility supervisor for all satellite wagering facilities operated by the state or on public land. The satellite facility supervisor shall, among other things, monitor the performance of licensees at the facilities. (b) A fair satellite facility generating less than ten million dollars ($10,000,000) annually in total handle may elect not to be subject to the requirements of this section if the board of directors of the fair satellite facility, after a public hearing, deems those requirements to be not economically feasible and all of the following requirements are met: (1) Thirty days prior to the public hearing, the fair board notifies the board in writing of its intention to take the action described in this subdivision. (2) The fair satellite facility shall continue to abide by all laws and regulations pertaining to the operation of a satellite facility, including the responsibilities of the position of satellite facility supervisor. (3) Notice of the fair board's action shall be provided to the board within 10 days of approval by the fair board. Notice shall include the name and contact information of the individual or individuals assuming the responsibilities of the position of satellite facility supervisor.