|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2443.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1915.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1505.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|