California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2011

Amended

Bill June 14, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011