California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill June 4, 2012
Bill August 18, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011