LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB276
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB276
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB276
Compare Versions
AB276 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB276 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB276 Amended August 22, 2012
AB276 Amended August 7, 2012
AB276 Amended June 19, 2012
AB276 Amended June 4, 2012
AB276 Amended August 18, 2011
AB276 Amended April 4, 2011
AB276 Introduced February 7, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB276 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB276 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB276 Amended August 22, 2012
AB276 Amended August 7, 2012
AB276 Amended June 19, 2012
AB276 Amended June 4, 2012
AB276 Amended August 18, 2011
AB276 Amended April 4, 2011
AB276 Introduced February 7, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare