|
07/11/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4221.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Assembly adopts Conference Committee report. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 5549.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From Conference Committee: Be adopted. Assembly (Ayes 2 (Eng and Feuer). Noes 1 (Wagner)). Senate (Ayes 2 (Evans and Calderon). Noes 0.)). To print.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly: Joint Rule 29.5(a) suspended. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4808.) In Senate: Joint Rule 29.5(a) suspended. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3498.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senators Evans, Calderon, and Blakeslee appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Senators Evans, Vargas, and Blakeslee appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 57. Page 4482.) Assembly Members Eng, Feuer, and Wagner appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3219.).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Price.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1505.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|