California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 11, 2012

Amended

Bill June 27, 2012
Bill September 1, 2011
Bill June 23, 2011