|
09/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6525.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4888.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1631.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|