California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB294 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill August 31, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011