|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 1124.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 977.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 21).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|