LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB298
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB298
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB298
Compare Versions
AB298 Amended August 6, 2012
AB298 Amended June 18, 2012
AB298 Amended April 14, 2011
AB298 Amended March 30, 2011
AB298 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB298 Amended August 6, 2012
AB298 Amended June 18, 2012
AB298 Amended April 14, 2011
AB298 Amended March 30, 2011
AB298 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare