California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill August 17, 2011
Bill June 28, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011
Bill April 7, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011